ANGEL CENTRE (WORCESTER)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of the property known as The Angel Centre for the purpose of providing affordable accommodation for other charitable and community based groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 08 May 1991: Standard registration
- WORCESTER CITY CENTRE COMMUNITY PROJECT (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS M D WILLIAMS | Chair |
|
||||||
NEIL ANDREW CAREY | Trustee | 19 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
KITTY MARY MACPHERSON ROSS | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
NICOLETTE NEVILLE-LEE | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN CLIFFORD GILES | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ANN ELLISON | Trustee | 05 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen McArdle | Trustee | 28 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN BENNETT | Trustee | 28 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.99k | £30.02k | £34.75k | £37.57k | £39.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.41k | £23.43k | £29.69k | £30.86k | £35.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.36k | £13.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 OCTOBER 1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 11 MARCH 1987 AND 16 JANUARY 1991 AND AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 1 OCTOBER 1993.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE MORE EFFECTIVE WORKING OF THE CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AS STATED IN SUB CLAUSE (2).FOR FURTHER INFORMATION SEE CLAUSE 2 OF MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
WORCESTER AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
ANGEL CENTRE (WORCESTER)
ANGEL PLACE
WORCESTER
WR1 3QN
- Phone:
- 01905617102
- Email:
- angel.centre@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window