DAVID LIVINGSTONE MEMORIAL HEALTH CARE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
Governance
- 10 May 1991: Standard registration
- 08 September 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- DLMHCF (Working name)
- DAVID LIVINGSTONE MEMORIAL HEALTH CENTRE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.69k | £3.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £749 | £4.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 10 May 2006 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 21 March 2005 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21ST MARCH 1991
Charitable objects
1)THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN ZAIRE(2)TO AWARD BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE THEM TO PURSUE A CAREER IN MEDICINE
Area of benefit
ZAIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window