British Friends of Ariel University

Charity number: 1002872
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Advancement of education generally and in particular of any educational establishment in the United Kingdom and Israel.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £106
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London
  • Israel

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 May 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • British Friends of Ariel University (Working name)
  • EDUCATION IN ISRAEL TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Howard John Pack Trustee 31 October 2022
None on record
Joel Messod Silberstein Trustee 08 December 2021
MIZRACHI (UK) ISRAEL SUPPORT TRUST
Received: On time
SEPHARDI KASHRUT AUTHORITY
Received: On time
BRITISH FRIENDS OF TZOHAR
Received: On time
ISRAEL MAGEN TRUST UK
Received: On time
UK FRIENDS OF ERETZ HEMDAH
Received: On time
THE BRITISH FRIENDS OF YESHIVAT HAKOTEL
Received: On time
David Morris Trustee
THE KADIMA FOUNDATION
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF FEDERATION OF JEWISH COMMUNITIES OF UKRAINE
Received: On time
MIZRACHI (UK) ISRAEL SUPPORT TRUST
Received: On time
YESHIVAT KEREM B'YAVNEH FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7 £13 £0 £1.48k £106
Total expenditure £0 £0 £3.55k £1.03k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 November 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 November 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 RALEIGH CLOSE
LONDON
NW4 2TA
Phone:
07973216383
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available