Trustees THE SAUDI BRITISH SOCIETY
Charity Number: 1002876

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir William Charters Patey KCMG, LLD | Chair | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr GHADAH WASEL A ALHARTHI | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM ROBERT McKAY | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Najah Mutlaq Alotaibi | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Wareed Hassn O Alenaini | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Intisar Ahmed H Alyamani | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Raed Ahmed M Farzan | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARK COLIN THOMPSON | Trustee | 04 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
KAREN WORCESTER | Trustee | 20 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr ASMA SIDDIKI | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER LIONEL HARRIGAN | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Countess of Sandwich Susan Caroline Montagu | Trustee | 01 January 2001 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.