Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF QUENIBOROUGH SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1002880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2024 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2023 30 October 2024 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2022 30 October 2024 487 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2021 30 October 2024 852 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2020 06 July 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 Not Required