Financial history FRIENDS OF QUENIBOROUGH SCHOOL

Charity number: 1002880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/09/2020 01/09/2021 01/09/2022 01/09/2023 01/09/2024
Total gross income £3.45k £358 £1.79k £1.04k £1.16k
Total expenditure £3.31k £2.48k £3.78k £489 £1.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A