Accounts and annual returns CHRIST CHURCH (ELTHAM) PARISH TRUST

Charity number: 1002884
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2012 11 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2011 19 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2010 06 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2009 17 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not Required