FRIENDS OF ST PETERS CHURCH WORFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUPPORT FOR ST PETERS CHURCH WORFIELD, SHROPSHIRE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Shropshire
Governance
- 10 May 1991: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mrs Collings | Trustee | 25 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev JEANNETTA STOKES | Trustee | 26 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10 | £10 | £10 | £10 | £10 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 204 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 204 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 570 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 570 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31 OCTOBER 1990
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION BY THE MAINTENANCE REPAIR AND UPKEEP OF THE FABRIC AND CONTENTS OF THE CHURCH AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SERVICES IN THE CHURCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WORFIELD
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WORFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VICARAGE
HALLON
WORFIELD
BRIDGNORTH
WV15 5JZ
- Phone:
- 01746716698
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window