GILEAD FOUNDATIONS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principle activities of the charity involve the provision of residential services and support for mental and physical restoration of persons suffering from drug and alcohol abuse or similar problems.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 May 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lois Esther Samuel | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Wynne Yeoman | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ceirion Wyn Harries | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALBERT ERIC SLOMAN | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr CLEMENT FERRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £265.55k | £224.33k | £246.10k | £221.03k | £105.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £242.07k | £190.73k | £268.60k | £236.58k | £109.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £97.85k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 14 May 2024 | 227 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 14 May 2024 | 227 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 MAY 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL REHABILITATION OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DRUG OR ALCOHOL ABUSE OR SIMILAR PROBLEMS BY PROVIDING THERAPY IN CONNECTION THEREWITH BY TEACHING THEM THE CHRISTIAN FAITH PRINCIPLES AND VALUES AND ADVANCING THEIR EDUCATION INCLUDING THE TEACHING OF LIFE SKILLS SO AS TO BETTER ENABLE THEM TO COPE WITH THE BUSINESS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gilead Foundation
Risdon Farm
Jacobstowe
OKEHAMPTON
EX20 3AJ
- Phone:
- 01837851240
- Email:
- admin@gilead.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window