1ST MALPAS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1002915
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote and provide scouting activities for young people in the Malpas and surrounding areas

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £15,285
Total expenditure: £18,368

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 May 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • 1ST MALPAS SCOUTS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS JANNINE DAVIES Chair 15 September 2012
None on record
THOMAS WOODWORTH Trustee 21 June 2015
None on record
LUKE WILLIAM ROBERTS Trustee 15 July 2013
None on record
STEVE CRADDOCK Trustee 03 December 2012
None on record
SUSAN DARLINGTON Trustee
None on record
JOHN MCDOWELL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.94k £4.77k £6.21k £23.82k £15.29k
Total expenditure £12.71k £3.77k £9.93k £19.25k £18.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £800

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 May 2024 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 July 2022 156 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 Hughes Lane
MALPAS
Cheshire
SY14 7FB
Phone:
01948860249