SOFT UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SOFT UK provides information and support to families affected by Trisomy 13 (Patau's syndrome), Trisomy 18 (Edwards' syndrome) and related disorders. SOFT UK runs a website, produces printed information and runs a volunteer befriender programme. SOFT UK also holds annual family days in England and Scotland and a biennial family day in Northern Ireland.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 May 1991: Standard registration
- SUPPORT ORGANISATION FOR TRISOMY 13 & 18 AND RELATED DISORDERS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS J FOWLER | Chair | 21 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
John Christopher O'Toole | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Wilson | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Louise Kadum | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Margaret Wirth | Trustee | 28 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Petrie | Trustee | 06 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALISON PEARSON | Trustee | 05 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS L EGAN | Trustee | 04 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR D ROBBINS | Trustee | 26 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.15k | £62.95k | £74.26k | £45.41k | £80.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.03k | £32.90k | £59.37k | £67.15k | £54.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26/04/1991 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 23/09/2003 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 16/03/2012
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SICKNESS OF CHILDREN WITH CHROMOSOMATIC ABNORMALITY AND OTHER RARE MEDICAL CONDITIONS (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF DECLARATION OF TRUST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Newlands Road
Uddingston
GLASGOW
G71 5QP
- Phone:
- 07748772061
- Email:
- enquiries@soft.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window