Financial history ABSOLUTE THEATRE COMPANY

Charity Number: 1002931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £15.17k £17.68k £7.32k £18.88k £27.77k
Total expenditure £15.65k £14.30k £19.92k £17.69k £18.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A