FRIENDS OF THE CENTRE FOR DISABLED CHILDREN, NARASARAOPET
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports the Centre for Disabled Children in Narasaraopet, Andhra Pradesh, South India, by promoting and assisting financially the activities carried out by the Centre's school. These activities advance education and relieve need amongst the children who attend the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- India
Governance
- 16 May 1991: Standard registration
- 16 May 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.43k | £511 | £458 | £173 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.30k | £14.00k | £6.00k | £15.00k | £6.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 19 April 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 01 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 16 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 06 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST MARCH 1991, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 22ND AUGUST 2005
Charitable objects
1)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TO RELIEVE NEED AMONGST THE CHILDREN AT THE CENTRE FOR DISABLED CHILDREN,NARASARAOPET,ANDHRA PRADESH,SOUTH INDIA(2)TO INCREASE PUBLIC AWARENESS IN THIS COUNTRY OF THE NEEDS OF DISABLED CHILDREN IN NARASARAOPET
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window