THE FFOREST UCHAF HORSE AND PONY REHABILITATION CENTRE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a small group who provide rescue, rehabilitation and sanctuary for needy horses & ponies with our meagre resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,200 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 16 May 1991: Standard registration
- THE PIT PONY SANCTUARY - FFOREST UCHAF HORSE AND PONY CENTRE (Working name)
- THE FFOREST UCHAF HORSE AND PONY REHABILITATION CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLINE LOUISE FITZGERALD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Joanna Williams | Trustee | 05 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clare Jane Thacker | Trustee | 05 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Alan Savage | Trustee | 21 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROY JAMES PECKHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA SHEILA PECKHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KIRSTY JAYNE SAVAGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.23k | £170.00k | £272.00k | £461.03k | £363.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.65k | £88.00k | £99.00k | £112.29k | £165.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11TH APRIL 1991
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF HORSES(WHICH EXPESSION SHALL INCLUDE PONIES,MULES AND DONKEYS)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 Bridge Street
KINGTON
HR5 3DJ
- Phone:
- 07990323811
- Email:
- info@pitponies.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window