Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF DANES HILL SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1002940
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 October 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 18 October 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2011 21 May 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 21 May 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2010 27 May 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 20 May 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2009 14 May 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 14 May 2010 On Time