THE SOULDERN UNITED CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides relief for people residing in the parish of Souldern who are in need, hardship or distress. It provides some housing accommodation, can make grants and can provide goods or services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 20 May 1991: Standard registration
- SOULDERN UNITED CHARITY (Working name)
- POOR'S ALLOTMENT ALMSHOUSE CHARITY (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katy Draper | Chair | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Hoodless | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Frances Jones | Trustee | 15 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Blunt | Trustee | 26 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
NORMA ELIZABETH JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MS SUE MEDHURST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.23k | £14.65k | £14.71k | £14.25k | £13.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.98k | £12.76k | £16.01k | £10.92k | £18.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 23 MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDING IN THE PARISH OF SOULDERN WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR PERSONS RESIDING IN THE PARISH; AND SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE.
Area of benefit
SOULDERN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Yew Cottage
Bates Lane
Souldern
BICESTER
OX27 7JU
- Phone:
- 01869345707
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window