BRITISH ORCHID COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BOC is an umbrella organisation for orchid growers, amateur and professional. It encourages the growing of orchids, trains and accredits orchid judges and organises and underwrites Congresses. It maintains a slide library and lecturers list for its members. Its website is a contact resource for anyone interested in growing orchids.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 May 1991: Standard registration
- B O C (Working name)
- BOC (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Barker | Chair | 02 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alan Mackenzie | Trustee | 02 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alison Daphne Caldwell | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Illsley | Trustee | 12 March 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.73k | £1.91k | £787 | £856 | £4.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.14k | £1.44k | £540 | £648 | £3.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/06/1990 AS AMENDED ON 01/03/1998 AS AMENDED ON 07/03/1999 AS AMENDED ON 05/03/2000 AS AMENDED ON 02/03/2002 AS AMENDED ON 09/03/2008 AS AMENDED ON 01/03/2009 AS AMENDED ON 04/03/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ALL ASPECTS OF THE STUDY CULTIVATION, BREEDING AND CONSERVATION OF ORCHID SPECIES AND HYBRIDS BY MEANS OF EXHIBITIONS, LECTURES, SHOWS AND INSTRUCTIVE LITERATURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
43A Corser Street
STOURBRIDGE
West Midlands
DY8 2DE
- Phone:
- 01384 378310
- Email:
- trustman@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window