Governing document BRITISH ORCHID COUNCIL
Charity number: 1002945

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/06/1990 AS AMENDED ON 01/03/1998 AS AMENDED ON 07/03/1999 AS AMENDED ON 05/03/2000 AS AMENDED ON 02/03/2002 AS AMENDED ON 09/03/2008 AS AMENDED ON 01/03/2009 AS AMENDED ON 04/03/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ALL ASPECTS OF THE STUDY CULTIVATION, BREEDING AND CONSERVATION OF ORCHID SPECIES AND HYBRIDS BY MEANS OF EXHIBITIONS, LECTURES, SHOWS AND INSTRUCTIVE LITERATURE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.