SOFA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Furniture Re-use Project originally set up to relieve hardship by providing low cost furniture and appliances to those in need. Provision of work experience and training for individuals seeking employment. Increasingly important is our environmental role in diverting items from landfill.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 21 May 1991: Standard registration
- S O F A (Working name)
- SUPPLIERS OF FURNITURE AND APPLIANCES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN DAVID GRANGER | Chair |
|
||||||
Diego Neyra Lopez | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Day | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN JOHN TETLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VAL BROOKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELLIE LOWE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £252.80k | £173.56k | £168.32k | £157.95k | £249.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £270.75k | £211.93k | £199.75k | £196.82k | £191.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £63.35k | £4.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/03/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/10/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/03/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/01/2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN LEICESTERSHIRE AND CONTIGUOUS AREAS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS ARISING THEREFROM BY: (1) THE PROVISION OF FURNITURE AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD ACCESSORIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS; AND (2) THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING, SUPPORT AND WORK EXPERIENCE FOR UNEMPLOYED PERSONS WHO VOLUNTEER AT SOFA
Area of benefit
LEICESTERSHIRE AND ITS CONTIGUOUS AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
S O F A
CLARENCE STREET
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE11 1DY
- Phone:
- 01509262557
- Email:
- office@sofareuse.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window