STOWMARKET U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Stowmarket U3A is affiliated to the Third Age Trust and as such is a learning cooperative which draws upon the knowledge, experience and skills of its own members to organise and provide interest groups in accordance with the wishes of the membership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Suffolk
Governance
- 21 May 1991: Standard registration
- STOWMARKET AND DISTRICT LEARNING ACTIVITIES IN RETIREMENT (Working name)
- S T A R THE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (Previous name)
- STOWMARKET U 3 A (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Dickson | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Robert Bradshaw | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Dickson | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Shelton | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Neil Instrall | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Cutting | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Durrant | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Gort | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Dorward | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Allan Taylor | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Glenda Kathleen Taylor | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Weedon | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.54k | £1.46k | £2.99k | £9.99k | £13.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.47k | £2.05k | £3.56k | £6.54k | £10.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17TH APRIL 1991 AS AMENDED 16TH MAY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED ON 18 SEP 2019 AS AMENDED ON 19 SEP 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
STOWMARKET AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Buttenhaugh Green
Elmswell
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
Suffolk
IP30 9HQ
- Phone:
- 01359 352104
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window