Financial history We Change Lives (WCL)

Charity number: 1003023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.02m £6.04m £5.70m £5.92m £9.50m
Total expenditure £8.02m £6.38m £5.50m £6.20m £9.40m
Income from government contracts £6.47m £5.32m £4.64m £4.76m £8.21m
Income from government grants £281.25k £137.81k £57.02k N/A £52.72k
Income - Donations and legacies £282.85k £140.37k £71.74k £51.79k £52.72k
Income - Other trading activities £6.72m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £5.88m £5.62m £5.83m £9.28m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.02k £5.58k £3.37k £30.31k £5.31k
Income - Other £1.40k £12.95k £4.00k £3.76k £158.83k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.02m £6.38m £5.50m £6.20m £9.40m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £109.10k £200.83k £440.99k £575.49k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0