SHIRLAND VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community centre for the use of people of the Parish of Shirland & Higham without distinction of political/religious/race/gender etc for recreation and leisure with the object of improving condintions and quality of life. Fund raising, hiring hall out with a discount for Parishioners to make it affordable to everyone. Running groups for young and old and organizing social events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £300 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 30 May 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Philip Bacon | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Julie Bacon | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY MATHER | Trustee | 06 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANNE BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS SHELLY GREEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.03k | £25.15k | £12.88k | £24.02k | £16.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.39k | £19.29k | £8.15k | £25.04k | £25.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £11.67k | £8.00k | £300 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1540 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | 01 March 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 7 MARCH 1991
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SHIRLAND AND HIGHAM INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SHIRLAND AND NEW HIGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 BURNSIDE AVENUE
SHIRLAND
ALFRETON
DE55 6AE
- Phone:
- 07803414446
- Email:
- anne.brown601@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window