ST JAMES C OF E SCHOOL APPEALS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1003076
Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Advancement of education at school using Gift Aid donations from parents. To fund specific educational projects as decided by the Appeals Assosciation.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022

Total income: £7,795
Total expenditure: £9,874

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Bolton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 June 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST JAMES C OF E SCHOOL APPEAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID VICKERY Trustee
None on record
WILLIAM THOMAS HEATON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £13.37k £11.43k £10.66k £7.48k £7.80k
Total expenditure £14.10k £15.10k £9.27k £3.09k £9.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 July 2023 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 April 2021 280 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 JANUARY 1987
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AT ST JAMES CHURCH OF ENGLAND COMPREHENSIVE SCHOOL IN FARNWORTH, BOLTON, GREATER MANCHESTER
Area of benefit
FARNWORTH
Registration history
  • 05 June 1991 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Higsons Chartered Accountants
93 Market Street
Farnworth
BOLTON
BL4 7NS
Phone:
01204861772
Website:

No information available