Financial history HANBURY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1003092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.78k £16.54k £20.89k £24.36k £18.32k
Total expenditure £7.01k £11.71k £33.14k £18.28k £30.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £2.67k N/A N/A