Accounts and annual returns DAWES HOUSE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1003097
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2017 13 March 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 02 March 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required