Financial history DAWES HOUSE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1003097
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2013 31/05/2014 31/05/2015 31/05/2016 31/05/2017
Total gross income £1.93k £2.30k £2.46k £1.41k £3.14k
Total expenditure £1.83k £1.58k £1.58k £1.26k £2.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A