WELSH SPORTS ASSOCIATION FOR PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADAPTED SPORT FOR PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILIYT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 11 June 1991: Standard registration
- 24 February 2025: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 24 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1144663 THE FEDERATION OF DISABILITY SPORT WALES LIMITED
- WSAPLD (Working name)
- WELSH SPORTS ASSOCIATION FOR PEOPLE WITH MENTAL HANDICAP (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 821 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 821 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1186 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1186 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1551 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1551 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MAY 1982 AS AMENDED 27 APRIL 1991 AS AMENDED 25 APRIL 1992 AND 6 JUNE 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF MENTALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR COMPETITURE AND NON COMPETITURE SPORT TO ASSIST IN THEIR INTERGRATION INTO SOCIETY
Area of benefit
WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window