SPRINGFIELD ADVICE AND LAW CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Springfield Advice & Law Centre provides independent legal advice for service users of South West London & St Georges Mental Health (NHS) Trust. It offers specialist advice and representation in housing, community care, debt and welfare benefits; plus general advice and referral in other areas of law; and provides information on legal matters affecting mental health service users.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £64,059 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Merton
- Sutton
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 11 June 1991: Standard registration
- SPRINGFIELD ADVICE AND LAW CENTRE (Working name)
- SPRINGFIELD LAW CENTRE (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Audrey DEHANEY | Chair | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bronwen GREY | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Cameron FARRELL | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Daniela Amadio | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Grainne Darlow | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chinelo Nnadi | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Russell John MAKIN | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £158.02k | £301.63k | £220.00k | £258.54k | £220.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £226.50k | £206.17k | £268.64k | £261.96k | £230.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £90.67k | £97.00k | £88.00k | £61.78k | £64.06k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2022 | 325 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2022 | 325 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 February 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 March 2021 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 14 MAY 1991; AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 29TH JUNE 1993 AND 12TH JULY 2000
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROVIDE AT SPRINGFIELD HOSPITAL AND AT OTHER HOSPITALS, DAY CARE CENTRES AND OTHER ESTABLISHMENTS FOR THE CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL ILLNESS OR DISORDER WITHIN THE AREA OF MERTON SUTTON AND WANDSWORTH HEALTH AUTHORITY AREA OR THE LONDON BOROUGH OF WANDSWORTH OR THE LONDON BOROUGH OF MERTON OR THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SUTTON OR ANY LONDON BOROUGH OR LOCAL AUTHORITY TO WHICH SOUTH WEST LONDON AND ST GEORGE'S MENTAL HEALTH NHS TRUST PROVIDES SERVICES, LEGAL AND OTHER ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO PERSONS REQUIRING THAT ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE BY REASON OF THEIR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL ILLNESS OR DISORDER, OR NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS (2) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING DUE TO MENTAL ILLNESS OR DISORDER BY PROVIDING EDUCATION IN THE LEGAL AND OTHER ASPECTS OF SUCH ILLNESS AND DISORDER AND OF PROBLEMS AFFECTING PERSONS WITH SUCH ILLNESS OR DISORDER
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGHS OF SUTTON, WANDSWORTH AND MERTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Newton Building 7
Springfield Hospital
61 Glenburnie Road
LONDON
SW17 7DJ
- Phone:
- 07957644468
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window