TELFORD HORSEHAY STEAM TRUST COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
heritage steam railway and educational provision
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 10 June 1991: Standard registration
- TELFORD STEAM RAILWAY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Allan Sidney Oliver | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Owen | Trustee | 20 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
mark Paynter | Trustee | 20 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN JONES | Trustee | 08 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER WHITEHEAD | Trustee | 08 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.40k | £115.40k | £419.63k | £146.64k | £242.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £141.75k | £141.75k | £156.39k | £137.73k | £181.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 03 January 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
29 February 2024
(These accounts |
03 January 2025 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 08 April 2024 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 08 April 2024 | 102 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 14 February 2024 | 413 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 14 February 2024 | 413 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 18 January 2022 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 18 January 2022 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 DECEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 25 JANUARY 1991
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRESENTATION OF STEAM AND OTHER RAILWAY LOCOMOTIVES, ROLLING STOCK MACHINERY AND EQUIPMENT OF EDUCATIONAL AND HISTORICAL INTEREST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Telford Steam Railway
The Old Loco Shed
Bridge Road
Horsehay
Telford
TF4 2NF
- Phone:
- 01952503880
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window