RECREATION GROUNDS ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH LOWER DARWEN UNITED REFORMED CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To administer the recreation grounds associated with the Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Blackburn With Darwen
Governance
- 11 June 1991: Standard registration
- LOWER DARWEN RECREATION GROUND (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Carter | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Margaret Weal | Trustee | 16 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
George Grime | Trustee | 07 March 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6 | £1.60k | £1.13k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.95k | £962 | £1.12k | £814 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2024 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 19 MARCH 1990
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF RECREATION GROUNDS FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF LOWER DARWEN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Area of benefit
LOWER DARWEN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
United Reformed Church
Unit 20, Waters Edge Business Park
Modwen Road
SALFORD
M5 3EZ
- Phone:
- 01617691122
- Email:
- trust@nwsynod.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window