THE BOLLIN SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to advance the education of the pupils at Bollin Primary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Trafford
Governance
- 12 June 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amy Kember | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Pickford | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Pickford | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
leann hines | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Cochrane | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kylie Spark | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.77k | £23.63k | £15.79k | £49.67k | £36.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.74k | £17.02k | £8.24k | £45.59k | £56.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 February 2025 | 236 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 February 2025 | 242 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 FEBRUARY 1991
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bollin Primary School
Apsley Grove
Bowdon
Altrincham
WA14 3AH
- Phone:
- 0161 928 8900
- Email:
- ptabollin@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window