Trustees WARWICKSHIRE GARDENS TRUST
Charity number: 1003176
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Diane Evelyn Trenchard James | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Jewel-Clark | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Lane | Trustee | 26 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ELIZABETH HANDSCOMBE | Trustee | 21 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Judith Al-Seffar | Trustee | 21 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Matthew Edward Fattorini | Trustee | 18 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Paul Baker | Trustee | 17 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE HODGETTS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.