TOYOTA-SHI TREVELYAN TRUST

Charity number: 1003181
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing scholarship and bursaries to enable students from the United Kingdom and Japan. to pursue study and research through the process of exchange. Thereby advance the International understanding and academic exchange between the United Kingdom and Japan.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £8,665
Total expenditure: £9,805

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 June 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Atsushi Nishikawa Trustee 11 July 2024
None on record
Lord Nicholas Bourne Trustee 29 June 2023
None on record
Azlinda Ezrina binti Ariffin Trustee 29 June 2023
INTERNATIONAL STUDENTS HOUSE
Received: On time
PAN ASIAN WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Karan Mithu Daswani Trustee 23 June 2022
POSITIVE VIEW FOUNDATION
Received: On time
INTERNATIONAL STUDENTS HOUSE
Received: On time
Yoshitsugu Oba Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
TOSHIHIKO OTA Trustee 04 December 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £15.40k £8.59k £9.32k £7.63k £8.66k
Total expenditure £19.72k £29.10k £4.60k £9.75k £9.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 24 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 23 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 21 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 24 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 17 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 PARK CRESCENT
REGENTS PARK
LONDON
W1B 1SH
Phone:
02076318301