FRIENDS OF SUMMERHILL SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund Raising Events to provide funds for resources to further the education of the children at the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sefton
Governance
- 13 June 1991: Standard registration
- F S S A (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Reeves | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Owens | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah O Halloran | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katie Jordan | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Clare Graham | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kristie Parry | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Ellen Sayers | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.38k | £2.10k | £11.37k | £11.67k | £7.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.13k | £1.88k | £10.41k | £4.86k | £17.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 SEPTEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Summerhill Primary School
Poverty Lane
LIVERPOOL
L31 3DT
- Phone:
- 01515261343
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window