Financial history FRIENDS OF WINDMILLS SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1003204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £15.31k £8.00k £2.30k £1.32k £7.01k
Total expenditure £9.00k £17.42k £8.12k £166 £15.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A