BUCKHORN WESTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDES A VENUE FOR ACTIVITIES OF BENEFIT FOR THE SURROUNDING COMMUNITY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 17 June 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS BEV OSBORNE | Chair |
|
||||||||
Jonathan Evans | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Patricia Smith | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Ann Duvall | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Alison Helen Berry | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||||
DAWN RACHAEL WILTON | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Sandra Ann Mackintosh | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||
AUDREY GLADYS BURT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MRS JILL ELSWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.14k | £29.41k | £21.20k | £20.53k | £21.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.00k | £11.50k | £15.54k | £20.86k | £23.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £667 | £25.14k | £11.23k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14TH MARCH 1962
Charitable objects
FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF BUCKHORN WESTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
BUCKHORN WESTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fieldcroft
Shepherds Hill
Buckhorn Weston
Gillingham
SP8 5HX
- Phone:
- 07789884984
- Email:
- bwvillagehall@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window