SHROPSHIRE BADGER GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of S.B.G. is to prevent badger abuse whether direct, accidental, or coincidental to other legal activities. We assist the Police and RSPCA in any investigations of abuse of badgers or setts and advise or assist individuals or organisations where badgers may present problems. We educate the general public about badger ecology
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Shropshire
Governance
- 19 June 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James William Ashley | Chair | 20 November 1991 |
|
|||||
PHILIP IAN LOVEDAY | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Margaret Ann Megan-Jones | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tris Pearce | Trustee | 24 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
HARRIET BARTLETT | Trustee | 25 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY LOUISE PRICE | Trustee | 25 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
SHARON DAVIES-CULHAM | Trustee | 25 July 2015 |
|
|||||
Michele Vaughan | Trustee | 26 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rod Bennett | Trustee | 17 June 1999 |
|
|
||||
Doug Hughes | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.60k | £6.20k | £17.15k | £7.21k | £7.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.57k | £5.42k | £11.46k | £8.47k | £7.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24 AUGUST 1989, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 14 MAY 1991.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MEASURES WHICH WILL ENHANCE THE WELFARE, CONSERVATION AND STUDY OF BADGERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hargreaves Cottage
Blackmore
Westbury
SHREWSBURY
SY5 9RL
- Phone:
- 01743271999
- Email:
- badgersbg@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window