Financial history HASTINGS FURNITURE SERVICE LIMITED

Charity number: 1003257
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £374.39k £395.89k £374.81k £361.94k £448.07k
Total expenditure £430.26k £369.27k £427.33k £479.13k £514.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £172.18k £16.17k N/A N/A