KINGS LANGLEY SCHOOL COVENANTED SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds to support major School activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 20 June 1991: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Fisher | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Setterfield | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Shephard | Trustee | 20 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
DIANE BELL | Trustee | 26 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARK MORANT | Trustee | 26 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES STICKLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.70k | £11.50k | £7.77k | £5.75k | £4.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.34k | £11.72k | £864 | £19.71k | £2.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 14 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH DEC 1989 AMENDED 7TH FEB 1991 AND 4TH FEBRUARY 2002
Charitable objects
ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF RESOURCES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE KINGS LANGLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
KINGS LANGLEY SCHOOL
LOVE LANE
KINGS LANGLEY
WD4 9HN
- Phone:
- 01923271742
- Email:
- FENEMORES@KLS.HERTS.SCH.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window