The International Association for the Study of Arabia

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The BFSA/IASA promotes and funds research on all aspects of the Arabian Peninsula through awarding research grants, publishing monographs and a Bulletin, holding public lectures and conferences on specific subjects, as well as the "Seminar for Arabian Studies", the only the annual international conference on all aspects of Arabia, the proceedings of which are published annually.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Bahrain
- Kuwait
- Oman
- Qatar
- Saudi Arabia
- United Arab Emirates
- Yemen
Governance
- 20 June 1991: Standard registration
- International Association for the Study of Arabia (Working name)
- THE BRITISH FOUNDATION FOR THE STUDY OF ARABIA (Previous name)
- THE SOCIETY FOR ARABIAN STUDIES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Peter Magee | Chair | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Timothy Insoll FBA | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr William Deadman | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Salman Ahmed Almahari | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Patricia Perry | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ahmad Al-Jallad | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Clive Holes | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Derek John Kennet | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jose Cristobal Carvajal Lopez | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Laura Crossman | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julian Jansen Van Rensburg | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Albert Noel Brehony | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIMON ALDERSON | Trustee | 02 March 2012 |
|
|||||
Dr ROBERT ANDREW CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.01k | £10.12k | £11.03k | £3.54k | £28.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.06k | £10.98k | £6.81k | £3.96k | £7.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 12 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 12 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 November 2023 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 APRIL 1991 AS AMENDED 21 MAY 2008 AND 23 JULY 2010 as amended on 12 Mar 2014 as amended on 21 Feb 2022 as amended on 24 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION BY PROMOTING THE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH RELATING TO THE ARABIAN PENINSULAR AND IN PARTICULAR ITS HISTORY ANTIQUITIES ARCHAEOLOGY ETHNOGRAPHY LANGUAGES LITERATURE ART CULTURE CUSTOMS GEOGRAPHY GEOLOGY AND NATURAL HISTORY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 Croham Road
SOUTH CROYDON
Surrey
CR2 7HE
- Phone:
- 02086882139
- Email:
- membership@theiasa.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window