Trustees ANDOVER CRISIS AND SUPPORT CENTRE

Charity number: 1003275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kimberley Ody Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Alexandra France Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Jane Dawson Trustee 27 September 2023
None on record
JEREMY STOKES Trustee 29 April 2022
NEW DIRECTIONS SUPPORT
Received: On time
Sue Filmer Trustee 01 February 2022
None on record
Janet Tomlinson Trustee 10 November 2010
None on record
JOHN BARLOW Trustee
None on record