JACK FOAT'S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Such charitable purposes for the benefit of the Parish of Ash as the Trustees may decide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 26 June 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARY LASLETT | Trustee | 19 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW WILKINSON | Trustee | 19 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANINE VALLACK | Trustee | 22 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
IAN STEWART CHANDLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.89k | £60.98k | £60.43k | £67.80k | £70.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.17k | £35.18k | £41.25k | £73.85k | £48.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 19TH SEPTEMBER 1978
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PARISH OF ASH AS THE EXECUTORS IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ASH
Contact information
- Address:
-
POPLARS
LOWER GOLDSTONE
ASH
CANTERBURY
CT3 2DT
- Phone:
- 01304812367
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window