Financial history EDUCATION ACTION

Charity Number: 1003323
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £3.24m £2.73m £2.52m £1.62m £1.22m
Total expenditure £3.60m £3.06m £3.17m £2.15m £1.02m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £329.22k £295.80k £323.20k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £2.18m £1.32m £886.73k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £1.74k £0 £6.42k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £7.10k £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £5.00k £20.55k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £2.96m £2.00m £969.37k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £9.45k £31.13k £31.01k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £1.29m £925.09k £599.32k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0