Governing document EDUCATION ACTION
Charity Number: 1003323
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 DECEMBER 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 5 FEBRUARY 1994, 18 JUNE 1996 AND 3 JULY 2008, AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
A. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY. B. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.