ST HUGH'S FOUNDATION FOR THE ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Hugh's encourages arts research and development by enabling applicants from Lincolnshire, East Yorkshire and the City of Hull to make their own impact regionally or nationally through new work in any of the art forms. With limited resources, it has a distinguished record of supporting innovative development projects that have made an impact in and far beyond the region of benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- Lincolnshire
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 25 June 1991: Standard registration
- THE ST HUGH'S FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tanya Akrofi | Chair | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Anderson | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phil White | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amie Alissa Watson | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tessa Oram | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kevin Byron | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Trowsdale | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Annabel McCourt | Trustee | 23 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tom Briggs | Trustee | 23 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kayla Bowtell | Trustee | 08 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan McCormick | Trustee | 24 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
NEIL ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.35k | £21.35k | £19.11k | £23.82k | £25.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.78k | £26.78k | £13.88k | £22.87k | £19.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 APR 1991 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 01 FEB 1996 AS AMENDED ON 24 JUL 2015 as amended on 21 Jul 2021 as amended on 30 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE THE MAINTENANCE IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF ARTISTIC TASTE, KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING, AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS.
Area of benefit
EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE NORTH AND NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE COUNTY AND CITY OF KINGSTON UPON HULL, LINCOLNSHIRE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
ANDREW & CO
ST SWITHIN'S COURT
1 FLAVIAN ROAD
NETTLEHAM ROAD
LINCOLN
LN2 4GR
- Phone:
- 01522512123
- Email:
- sthughscharity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window