WITTON PARK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular users of village hall include Pilates, Mother & Toddlers, Art Class. Hall available for hire for private parties, dances, meetings etc. Facilities include car park, disabled access, kitchen, large main hall (divisible), small upper room.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £1,104 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
Governance
- 19 July 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katharine Lesley Wood | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Richards | Trustee | 02 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Robson | Trustee | 02 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Fairish | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Richards | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Alan Brown | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Mcleod | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Thexton | Trustee | 03 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stanley Thexton | Trustee | 03 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR CROMPTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN CROMPTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH HILL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.94k | £36.80k | £14.82k | £23.84k | £16.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.12k | £21.55k | £18.37k | £25.75k | £9.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.90k | £30.74k | £2.67k | £11.86k | £1.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 December 2022 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 December 2022 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 May 2022 | 186 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 APR 2010.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WITTON PARK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND THE INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
WITTON PARK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Witton Park Village Hall
20 Main Street
Witton Park
BISHOP AUCKLAND
County Durham
DL14 0DX
- Phone:
- 07476109611
- Email:
- wpca2@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window