Financial history THE HELP A POOR OR NEEDY CHILD FUND

Charity Number: 1003359
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £968 £1.50k £5.52k £512 £1.23k
Total expenditure £7.13k £4.40k £6.81k £2.98k £899
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A