Accounts and annual returns CHRISTIAN ACTION HOUSING ASSOCIATION TRUST

Charity number: 1003377
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 November 2024 294 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 March 2021 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required