CHRISTIAN ACTION HOUSING ASSOCIATION TRUST

Charity number: 1003377
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The assistance of the provision of housing and associated amenities to those in need

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet
  • Enfield
  • Haringey
  • Waltham Forest

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 June 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Cunningham Trustee 25 September 2018
None on record
ADRIAN LEE Trustee 19 September 2017
None on record
Matthew Nicol Trustee 02 January 2013
None on record
ANN REYNARD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £457 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 November 2024 294 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 March 2021 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CHRISTIAN ACTION HOUSING
BENEDICT HOUSE
61 ISLAND CENTRE WAY
ENFIELD
EN3 6GS
Phone:
01992765900