HealthSense UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are the advancement for the public benefit of medical knowledge, training and care in all its branches and in particular the development of good practices in the assessment and testing of treatments and the conduct of clinical trials generally and the promotion of high standards of health care by practitioners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 July 1991: Standard registration
- HEALTHWATCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Alison Dorothy Murray | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Saba Ul-Hasan | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizaveta Osipenko | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew James Fulton | Trustee | 31 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Roger Anthony Fisken MA DPhil | Trustee | 17 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Phillipa Pigache | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alan Henness | Trustee | 20 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Keith Isaacson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JOHN ILLMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JAMES MATTHEW MAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR LES ROSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR NICK ROSS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.92k | £3.99k | £6.55k | £5.44k | £20.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.90k | £8.34k | £8.27k | £13.46k | £9.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 06 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 10TH JUNE 1991 as amended on 06 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF MEDICAL KNOWLEDGE, TRAINING AND CARE IN ALL ITS BRANCHES AND IN PARTICULAR THE DEVELOPMENT OF GOOD PRACTICES IN THE ASSESSMENT AND TESTING OF TREATMENTS AND THE CONDUCT OF CLINICAL TRIALS GENERALLY AND THE PROMOTION OF HIGH STANDARDS OF HEALTH CARE BY PRACTITIONERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crowcroft
Ashampstead
READING
RG8 8RT
- Phone:
- 07799457418
- Email:
- daardon.rf@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window